+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ13ER)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On December 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100579D
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2014: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2014: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor