+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ124ER)
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ124E
- Taken up
- Committee amendment agreed to
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 043720316-E
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 043720316
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2004: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (37-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2004: Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor