+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ122ER)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ122S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 044345316-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
- Committee substitute printed 044345316-S1
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 3-N)
- Agreed to by House (89-Y 3-N)
- Printed as engrossed 044650316-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ122E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (11-Y 3-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 044650316