+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 8, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1015)
On April 10, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter 1015 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ121ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (24-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO (24-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (25-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO (25-Y 12-N)
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N 1-A)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reading waived
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 7-N)
- Agreed to by House (88-Y 7-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 006942772-H1
- Amendment #2 by Del. Cranwell not germane
- Amendment #1 by Del. Cranwell rejected
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 006942772-H1
- Taken up
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 006942772-H1
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 006895772
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: AGREE TO (24-Y 13-N)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: AGREE TO (25-Y 12-N)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 2, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 7-N)
January 31, 2000: Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor