+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 28, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ112ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (Viva Voce Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988865408
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor