+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 14102916D
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ108ER)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102916D
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2014: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2014: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor