+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 23, 1998 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ107ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 4-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Hanger agd. to 986486666-S1 (21-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR SUB. HANGER V (21-Y 19-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 986486666-S1
- Floor substitute printed 986486666-S1 (Hanger)
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Amendment by Mr. Grayson rejected
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989204144
- Referred to Committee on Rules