+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Rejected by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Amendment #1 by Mr. Rollison agreed to
- Amendment #2 by Mr. Rollison agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 984305312-E
- Agreed to by House (74-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 21-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (22-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/15/97 984305312
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 21-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (22-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor