+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 759 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB999ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 18108303D-H1
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: McDougle, Stanley, Dance
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Byron, Robinson, Bagby
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107962D-S3 (0-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute rejected 18107343D-S1
- Committee substitute rejected 18107687D-S1
- Floor substitute printed 18107962D-S3 (Hanger)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 18107962D-S3
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB999S3
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107687D-S2
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107343D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (21-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104596D
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology