+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
On April 6, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 726 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB999ER)
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 16-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (77-Y 16-N)
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N)
- Read third time and passed House (85-Y 15-N)
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 023942836-H1
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - com sub 023942836-H1 (53-Y 44-N)
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (53-Y 44-N)
On January 30, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
- Substitute bill reprinted 023942836-H1
On January 29, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 023942836-H1
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 023934836
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 16-N)
February 25, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N)
January 31, 2002: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (53-Y 44-N)
January 28, 2002: Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor