+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Continued to 2011 in Appropriations by voice vote
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10104796D-H1
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #3
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101884D
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2010: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor