+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB997ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105290D-S1 (93-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB997S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105290D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14105290D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB997H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104521D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104521D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103431D