+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
- Enacted, Chapter 848 (effective 7/1/10)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB994ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB994ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102495D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2010: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor