+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0661)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 661 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB993ER)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD5136358 (HB993H1)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1994: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (121)
Type:
Primary Sponsor