+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 859 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 27, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB993ER)
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N)
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by Trans. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 042617260-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB993H1
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 042617260-H1
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (22-Y 3-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 8
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 049498332