+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB993E
- Printed as engrossed 10102485D-E
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10102485D
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102485D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2010: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
February 10, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor