+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 398 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB992ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (92-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB992H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20105670D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 1-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
- Committee substitute printed 20105670D-H1
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105312D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 6-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
January 22, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Les R. Adams
Type:
Primary Sponsor