+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 7, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0325)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 325 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB991ER)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- Printed as engrossed 005170912-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 005170912
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 29, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2000: Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 13, 2000: Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor