+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2001 in Finance (14-Y 2-N)
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 20-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 003623908-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds (23-Y 5-N)
- Read first time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from H. W. I. (15-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 003623908