+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 660 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB985ER)
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed