+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 7, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 759 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB984ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 985462351-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Stosch agreed to 985477743-S2
- Floor substitute printed 985477743-S2 (Stosch)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 985477743-S2
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985462351-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985531351-E
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Finance with amd. (21-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985531351
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 23, 1998: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with amd. (21-Y 1-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor