+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
On April 8, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 367 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB983ER)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 040811780
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor