+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 674 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB980ER)
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB980H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 062880324-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 062880324-H1
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Courts of Justice sub-committee: Civil Law
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 067351324
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor