+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 898 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0898)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB980ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108525D-S1 (52-Y 44-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chair votes Yes
- Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 20-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB980S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108525D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20108525D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N)
- Read third time and passed House (52-Y 45-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106266D-H1
- Delegate Gilbert floor amendments ruled not germane
- Delegate Gilbert floor amendment ruled not germane
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB980H1
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
- Incorporates HB1060 (Adams, D.M.)
- Committee substitute printed 20106266D-H1
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105164D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 20-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
January 28, 2020: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N)
January 22, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsor
Charniele L. Herring
Type:
Primary Sponsor