+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 452 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB978ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Local Gov sub: Charter
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB978H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105245D-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12105245D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102986D
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2012: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor