+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (44-Y 48-N)
- Engrossment refused by House (44-Y 48-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 022408890
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2002: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (44-Y 48-N)
February 1, 2002: Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor