+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10104216D-H1
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103160D
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2010: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor