+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 698 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB970ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rehab sub: Social Services
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #2
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102964D