+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 7 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB97ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 10-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (87-Y 10-N)
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (9-Y 4-N 2-A)
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N)
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N)
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 6-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #2
On December 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101465D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 15, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 10-N)
February 13, 2012: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N)
February 10, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Reported from Transportation with amendment (9-Y 4-N 2-A)
January 30, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N)
January 24, 2012: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 6-N)
January 18, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor