+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 493 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB97ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Edwards agreed to
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB97E
- Printed as engrossed 10100378D-E
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
On January 5, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100378D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2010: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor