+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 28 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB967ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB967H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20105996D-H1
- Read second time
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Incorporates HB930 (Coyner)
- Committee substitute printed 20105996D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102552D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
January 16, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Rodney T. Willett
Type:
Primary Sponsor