+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB96H1
- Passed by temporarily
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104737D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 14104737D-H1
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On December 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100796D
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2014: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
February 5, 2014: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor