+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Appropriations by voice vote
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed LD5940468 (HB96H2)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (7-Y 3-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute agreed to
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed LD4967396 (HB96H1)
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (11-Y 9-N)
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: 1
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed