+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 737 (effective 4/10/94)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB956ER)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 9-N)
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD6679126 (HB956E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1994: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor