+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)
- Enacted, Chapter 166 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB956ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 10105704D-H1
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB956ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101897D