+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB955ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18104693D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB955E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104693D
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 19, 2018: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2018: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor