+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Continued to 2015 in General Laws by voice vote
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote
- Reconsidered by GL Sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101616D
+ − Vote
January 23, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor