+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 97 (effective 7/1/02)
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB95ER)
On February 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 023902740-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 21, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
- Assigned to M., P. & P. S. sub-committee: 2
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/01 023902740
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2002: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
January 18, 2002: Reported from M., P. & P. S. with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor