+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
On April 13, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 451 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB948ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-com: Criminal Law and Procedure
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989753825-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 989753825-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989753825-H1
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982885825
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (8)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor