+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB946ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB946H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104701D-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104701D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103706D
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor