+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 2, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
On April 1, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 285 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB942ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (11-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2002 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 29, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 025410856-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 025410856
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2002: Reported from C. & L. with amendments (11-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2002: Reported from C. & L. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor