+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0397)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 397 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB940ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 16101410D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB940E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101410D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor