+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 37 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB940ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (66-Y 32-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Pending question ordered
- Read second time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #1
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101764D
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2012: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 10, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
February 1, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N)
January 27, 2012: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 5-N)
January 26, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor