+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 249 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB94ER)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/98 987335176
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor