+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100878D
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety