+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 346 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB937ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB937H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 061026428-H1
- Read second time
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 061026428-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 061014116
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor