+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Motion to override Governor's veto rejected (54-Y 45-N)
- VOTE: (54-Y 45-N)
- House sustained Governor's veto
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB93ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (34-Y 5-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (34-Y 5-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (69-Y 28-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 28-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987334176-E
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (19-Y 5-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims (7-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/98 987334176
- Referred to Committee on Claims
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (54-Y 45-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (34-Y 5-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (34-Y 5-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 28-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (19-Y 5-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from Claims (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor