+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 584 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB926ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N)
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB926H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104200D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by until February 10, 2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104200D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102544D
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N)
January 31, 2014: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor