+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 534 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB924ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 982016176-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 982016176-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 982016176-S1
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Juv. Justice & Dom. Rel.
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rereferred by Fin. (17-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reconsidered by Appropriations
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (10-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 986023176-E
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986023176
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rereferred by Fin. (17-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (10-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor