+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 792 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB923ER)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 11-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD2790350 (HB923E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (21-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1994: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor